This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 10:17:45 (UTC).

TORRES, JANET VS VENTURA, ALEXANDRA HURTADO

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 TORRES, JANET filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against VENTURA, ALEXANDRA HURTADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK, RONALD F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK, RONALD F.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES JANET

Respondent

VENTURA ALEXANDRA HURTADO

 

Court Documents

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/7/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/7/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/7/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/7/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order

4/28/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Frank, Ronald F., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.