This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 21:39:15 (UTC).

TORRES, EDUARDO VS PORRAS, YURI

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 TORRES, EDUARDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PORRAS, YURI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0845

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES EDUARDO

Respondent

PORRAS YURI

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/19/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/19/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/19/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/19/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/19/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

6/19/2020: Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

7/21/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons

7/21/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Entry of Judgment

9/17/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

9/17/2020: Judgment

Request - Enter Default FL165

9/4/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

9/4/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

9/4/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/4/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less