This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2023 at 05:04:49 (UTC).

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS BUILT, INC., A CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUILT, INC , A CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6845

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

BUILT INC. A CORPORATION;

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER

WORTHE TODD CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Substitution of Attorney

2/2/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

Answer

1/31/2023: Answer

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/17/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

12/6/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/11/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 04/11/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCase numbers 21STCV40405, and 22STCV36845 consolidated; case number 21STCV40405 is the lead case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC, a limited liability corporation, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 57 - Hon. Michael Smalleffective 02/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
11/30/2022

DocketAddress for Jennifer T Sanchez (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT, INC., a corporation; (Defendant); ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC, a limited liability corporation, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT, INC., a corporation; (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT, INC., a corporation; (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less