Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 13:10:06 (UTC).

TONYA LOVELL, ET AL. VS GIDI COHEN ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 TONYA LOVELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GIDI COHEN ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7638

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOVELL MATTHEW

LOVELL TONYA

Defendants

GIDI COHEN ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CGI STRATEGIES A CALIFORNIA ENTITY

AMC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

COHEN GIDI

LOS FELIZ BLISS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERBARSEGHIAN ARN

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/1/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/1/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/1/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELEINE

3/15/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELEINE

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELEINE

2/26/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MADELEINE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (For Madeleine); Filed by Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Madeleine); Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tonya Lovell (Plaintiff); Matthew Lovell (Plaintiff); Madeleine Rose Lovelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DERBARSEGHIAN, AREN