Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 00:19:12 (UTC).

TONY TRUONG VS PHARMAVITE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 TONY TRUONG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PHARMAVITE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1673

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUONG TONY

Defendants

HERRERA BEATRICE

PHARMAVITE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG RANDY

Defendant Attorney

CHEFFER ALLISON E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tony Truong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tony Truong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PHARMAVITE LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); BEATRICE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PHARMAVITE LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tony Truong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tony Truong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tony Truong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY