This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 09:19:20 (UTC).

TONY GALLARDO VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 TONY GALLARDO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6039

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLARDO TONY

Defendants

DOE 1 JUAN

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYON GEOFFREY C.

Defendant Attorney

SOLANO AMBER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/16/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

4/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/19/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

4/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance

6/14/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Confidential Information); Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tony Gallardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON GEOFFREY C. ESQ.