This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 05:59:00 (UTC).

TONY G. AZZI, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 TONY G AZZI, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4665

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMINI ERIN GREER

AZZI BOUTROS

AZZI GEORGE

AZZI GHADA

AZZI GIANNA V.

AZZI LARA

AZZI MARIE

AZZI PAUL

AZZI TONY G.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNHEIM STEVEN J

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DAVINA S. AZZI)

10/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DAVINA S. AZZI)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

7/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/20/2022

5/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/20/2022

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/23/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/26/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY)

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY)

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (EDISON INTERNATIONAL)

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (EDISON INTERNATIONAL)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute [21SMCV01768]; F...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Davina S. Azzi); Signed and Filed by: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff); As to: Davina S. Azzi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Davina S. Azzi): Filed By: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other of Bakla...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Steven J Bernheim (Attorney): Middle Name changed from J. to J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/22/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff); Gianna V. Azzi (Plaintiff); Davina S. Azzi (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff); Gianna V. Azzi (Plaintiff); Davina S. Azzi (Plaintiff); Ghada Azzi (Plaintiff); Boutros Azzi (Plaintiff); Erin Greer Amini (Plaintiff); Paul Azzi (Plaintiff); Marie Azzi (Plaintiff); George Azzi (Plaintiff); Lara Azzi (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tony G. Azzi (Plaintiff); Gianna V. Azzi (Plaintiff); Davina S. Azzi (Plaintiff); Ghada Azzi (Plaintiff); Boutros Azzi (Plaintiff); Erin Greer Amini (Plaintiff); Paul Azzi (Plaintiff); Marie Azzi (Plaintiff); George Azzi (Plaintiff); Lara Azzi (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER