This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:05:47 (UTC).

TONY BLONDAL VS MORNING VIEW HOTELS LQI LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 TONY BLONDAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MORNING VIEW HOTELS LQI LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5751

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BLONDAL TONY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LA QUINTA INN & SUITES

DOES 1 TO 20

MORNING VIEW HOTELS LQI LLC

OCENA PARK HOTELS LQI LLC

CALI PAINT COMPANY ROE 2

IMS CONSTRUCTION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CALI PAINT COMPANY ROE 2

IMS CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BANAFSHE P. RYAN

SALINAS ARTURO TRINIDAD

Other Attorneys

BARATTA JAMES M

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/6/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Substitution of Attorney

10/25/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

6/4/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

6/5/2019: Ex Parte Application

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by IMS CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party); Cali Paint Company (ROE 2) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tony Blondal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or Continue Trial) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or Continue Trial); Filed by IMS CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael E. McCabe in Support of Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or Continue Trial); Filed by IMS CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by IMS CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Ocena Park Hotels LQI, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Morning View Hotels LQI, LLC (Legacy Party); Ocena Park Hotels LQI, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tony Blondal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tony Blondal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tony Blondal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Brad M. Elder, Esq. (SBN 174532) %D DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES connty

21680 Gateway Center Drive, Suite 100 .

Diamond Bar, CA 91765 DEC 04 20V .

Main (909) 612-3930; Fax (855) 260-0261 bopvt et 4er mfi;afi;-wfierk Direct (909) 612-3945; E-mail: bmelder@travelers.com iy et T D

Glorieita Ketnis o,

e Attorneys for Cross-Complainants, OCEAN PARK HOTELS LQI, LLC; AND MORNING VIEW HOTELS LQI, LLC DBA LA QUINTA INN & SUITES

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL

TONY BLONDAL, Case No.: BC645751