This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 20:31:14 (UTC).

TONISHA RESHONDA PINE VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 TONISHA RESHONDA PINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0049

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE TONISHA RESHONDA

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA JESSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tonisha Reshonda Pine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON KEVIN