Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:27:41 (UTC).

TONIANN MONACO VS SEVADA NAZARI

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 TONIANN MONACO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEVADA NAZARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3279

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MONACO TONIANN

Defendants and Respondents

SEVADA NAZARI

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

NAZARI SEVADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BLONS MARK E. ESQ.

BLONS MARK EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/31/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

3/21/2019: Unknown

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

11/29/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Settlement

2/13/2019: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Toniann Monaco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Toniann Monaco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Sevada Nazari (Defendant); Nazari Sevada (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Toniann Monaco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint Demand For Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Toniann Monaco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Toniann Monaco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less