This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:32:52 (UTC).

TONI WILLIAMS VS BRISTOL FARMS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 TONI WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRISTOL FARMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3053

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILLIAMS TONI

Defendants and Respondents

BRISTOL FARMS

DOES 1 TO 50

FARMS BRISTOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GMELICH THOMAS P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Continue Trial Date

11/14/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice of Ruling

12/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND A NEUROLOGICAL EXAMINATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO EXCLUDE EXPERTS, AND DECLARATION OF THOMAS P. GMELICH

8/9/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND A NEUROLOGICAL EXAMINATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO EXCLUDE EXPERTS, AND DECLARATION OF THOMAS P. GMELICH

Separate Statement

8/9/2019: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL IME OF PLAINTIFF

8/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL IME OF PLAINTIFF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

Motion for Protective Order

1/22/2019: Motion for Protective Order

Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order and Request for Monetary Sanctions

2/5/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order and Request for Monetary Sanctions

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITT KARP AND TONI WILLIAMS

2/5/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITT KARP AND TONI WILLIAMS

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WITNESS ARTHUR BOONE

2/8/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WITNESS ARTHUR BOONE

Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Protective Order

2/11/2019: Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Protective Order

Reply - Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition of Arthur Boone

2/15/2019: Reply - Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition of Arthur Boone

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion for...)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion for...)

Order - Order re: Motion to Compel and Motions for Protective Orders

2/25/2019: Order - Order re: Motion to Compel and Motions for Protective Orders

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition of Wi...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition of Wi...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition of Wi...) of 02/25/2019

2/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition of Wi...) of 02/25/2019

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

8/27/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

DEFENDANT, BRISTOL FARMS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, TONI WILLIAMS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT'S (SET TWO)

8/6/2018: DEFENDANT, BRISTOL FARMS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, TONI WILLIAMS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT'S (SET TWO)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Hearing08/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, BRISTOL FARMS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, TONI WILLIAMS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT'S (SET TWO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT, BRISTOL FARMS TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Toni Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Toni Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Toni Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693053    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TONI WILLIAMS,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BRISTOL FARMS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC693053

[TENATATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 13, 2019

INITIAL NOTE: The Court will be dark on Friday, 12/13/19.  If the parties submit on the tentative, no appearance will be necessary.  If the parties wish to be heard in connection with the tentative, they must appear on Monday, 12/16/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  If that date and time are not available for the parties, the parties must meet and confer among themselves to agree upon a new date for the hearing (at 1:30 p.m.), and use the online scheduling system to reschedule the hearing on the motion.   Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. 

Plaintiff filed this action on 2/06/18 for damages arising out of a slip and fall.  Defendant has had difficulty obtaining depositions of the PMKs from Plaintiff’s various medical providers.  The parties have an IDC scheduled concerning the depositions on 12/16/19, and Defendant anticipates potentially filing motions to compel, which will be heard in January of 2020.   Defendant also notes that Plaintiff has relatively recently made a claim of TBI, which needs to be fully evaluated.  Finally, Defendant indicates the parties wish to mediate the matter, but mediation will not be completed until May of 2020.  Based on the foregoing, Defendant brings a stipulated motion to continue the trial date.

The Court finds Defendant met its burden to show a trial continuance is necessary, and fully justified the duration (six months) of the request.  The 2/24/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 8/25/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The 2/10/20 FSC is advanced to today’s date and continued to 8/11/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3.  All discovery and expert cut-off dates are continued to reflect the new trial date. 

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.