Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 08:54:22 (UTC).

TONG ZHANG VS TAPESTRY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 TONG ZHANG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TAPESTRY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3066

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHANG TONG

Defendants

TAPESTRY INC.

XU YA QUING AKA LEAH XU AKA LEAH XU

LI LAN QING AKA NANCY LI AKA NANCY LI

CHAO MIMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK MICHAEL T

Defendant Attorney

TOBIAS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

6/25/2020: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/07/2020

5/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FOR OSC RE DISMISSAL

4/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FOR OSC RE DISMISSAL

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/26/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS OF $250 AGAINST COUNSEL FOR...)

3/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS OF $250 AGAINST COUNSEL FOR...)

Notice of Ruling

1/31/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 11/26/2019

11/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 11/26/2019

Case Management Statement

11/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

10/3/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

5/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of the entire action for failure to prosecute and plaintiff's failure to appear on 6/25/2020) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (FOLLOWING OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE); Filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Defendant); MIMI CHAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Defendant); MIMI CHAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for failure to prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for failure to prosecute) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Tapestry, Inc's Answer to pltf Tong Zhang's Unverified Complaint); Filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by TONG ZHANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by TONG ZHANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TONG ZHANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TONG ZHANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TONG ZHANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAPESTRY INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.