This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 23:46:26 (UTC).

TOMMY PINK VS INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 TOMMY PINK filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1573

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINK TOMMY

Defendants

ROQUE NORA

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

TATE DEBBIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS MANSFIELD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM

8/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM

Complaint

8/19/2020: Complaint

PI General Order

9/8/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • Hearing08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tommy Pink (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (Civil Case Addendum); Filed by Tommy Pink (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tommy Pink (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tommy Pink (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant