This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 18:48:28 (UTC).

TOMIGAL, JOHN T. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 TOMIGAL, JOHN T - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRY, WILLIAM and ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0214

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARRY, WILLIAM

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

STRELTZER ADAM LEE ESQ

Respondent

OGAN CHRISTY

Trustees and Not Classified By Court

FEDERIZO AILEEN

TOMIGAL JOHN T.

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

ANSON BRIAN W.

Interested Parties

CORUGEDO AUSTIN

LEHR CHRISTOPHER

CORUGEDO SHEILA LEHR

KEYSTONE LAW GROUP PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

STRELTZER ADAM LEE

Respondent Attorneys

PARISER ABAHAM I

BOYCE LESLIE ANN

Trustee and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

KIM DAVID M

KIM DAVID M.

SHEPPARD BRIAN JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/19/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/14/2021: Minute Order

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

1/14/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

5/24/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

7/7/2021: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

7/13/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Request - Special Notice

6/24/2021: Request - Special Notice

Minute Order

3/2/2021: Minute Order

Objection - Appoint a Temporary Conservator - Response and Objection to Petition for Appointment of Temp Conservator

1/12/2021: Objection - Appoint a Temporary Conservator - Response and Objection to Petition for Appointment of Temp Conservator

Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object - Notice of Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object

9/2/2021: Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object - Notice of Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object

Order - ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/21/2021: Order - ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB09278

10/7/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB09278

Inventory & Appraisal - Partial No. 1

8/30/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Partial No. 1

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

8/6/2021: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination

7/26/2021: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination

Order - Appointing Conservator - Person and Estate

7/27/2021: Order - Appointing Conservator - Person and Estate

Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

7/16/2021: Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Corrected Capacity Declaration (Dr David W Trader MD)

7/16/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Corrected Capacity Declaration (Dr David W Trader MD)

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (21STPB09278 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder (ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object (Notice of Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Partial No. 1 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator (Person and Estate ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Care Plan/Determination; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Guardian Ad Litem Adam L. Streltzer RE Exigency and Notice ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator ([Appearing 01/13/2021] Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application ([Appearing 01/13/2021] Ex Parte Application for Good Cause Exception to Notice of Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYCE LESLIE ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARISER ABAHAM I