This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:26:56 (UTC).

TOMASA ROBLES VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 TOMASA ROBLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1395

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROBLES TOMASA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPOR-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

NORDANYAN MINAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MANN EDWIN C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

5/15/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

5/15/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/11/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

10/11/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/13/2017: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order

4/5/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

4/4/2019: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

4/4/2019: Opposition

Unknown

4/2/2019: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

3/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

3/7/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

10/29/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS; DECLARATION OF MINAS NORDANYAN, ESQ.

9/26/2018: DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS; DECLARATION OF MINAS NORDANYAN, ESQ.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial and all related dates) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial and all rel...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Continue Trial and all related dates); Filed by Tomasa Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Tomasa Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing; Filed by Tomasa Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tomasa Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tomasa Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1395    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

tomasa robles,

Plaintiff,

v.

los angeles county metropolitan transportation authority,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****1395

Hearing Date: February 7, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendants’ Motions to compel discovery responses

Plaintiff Tomasa Robles (“Plaintiff”) alleges that she slipped and fell on a bus owned and operated by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (“Defendant”). Defendant moves to compel Plaintiff to respond to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production. In its order of October 3, 2019, based upon the parties’ stipulation, the Court reopened discovery only for a limited purpose:

Discovery is reopened for the limited purposes of: Allowing plaintiff to designate one (1) new medical expert/damages expert; Defendant can set deposition for plaintiff’s witnesses Cynthia Guzman and Erica Marquez; Plaintiff can depose defendant’s expert Charles Rosen.

(Court’s Minute Order, dated October 3, 2019.) The Court did not authorize Defendant to serve supplemental discovery requests. Defendant has not demonstrated that Plaintiff stipulated in writing to respond to such requests after the discovery cut-off, as required. (See Code Civ. Proc., ; 2024.060.) Therefore, the motions are denied.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel are denied. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 7, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN EDWIN C.