This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 06:13:55 (UTC).

TOMAS CORTEZ ALBA VS RAUL HINOJOSA-OJEDA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 TOMAS CORTEZ ALBA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RAUL HINOJOSA-OJEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0086

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ ALBA TOM S

Defendant

HINOJOSA-OJEDA RA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CULLEN PAUL T.

Defendant Attorney

CARYL JESSE M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/8/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

5/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Answer

5/11/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

5/5/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Continuance

5/5/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/7/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/15/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/04/2023

1/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/04/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/30/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2024
  • Hearing01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Paul T. Cullen (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketAddress for Paul T. Cullen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...): Status Date changed from 05/19/2023 to 05/19/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) to (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 updated: Result Date to 05/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference (CMC) scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 updated: Result Date to 05/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Tomas Cortez Alba (Plaintiff); Judge Name: William F. Fahey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Paul Thomas Cullen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tomas Cortez Alba (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tomas Cortez Alba (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Hinojosa-Ojeda (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tomas Cortez Alba (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Hinojosa-Ojeda (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less