This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 07:04:25 (UTC).

TOMAS BUSTOS VS THE KROGER CO., AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 TOMAS BUSTOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO , AN OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9528

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSTOS TOMAS

Defendants

THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC.; A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YAHOUDAI YOSI

YAHOUDAI YOSI B.

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

9/8/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

7/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

7/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/23/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/7/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/1/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/29/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Hearing06/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC.; a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Defendant's Opposition to Demurrer); Filed by FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC.; a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO THE ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANTS, RALPHS GROCERY COMP ANY DBA FOOD 4 LESS'S;); Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC.; a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC.; a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TOMAS BUSTOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAHOUDAI YOSI ESQ.