This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:58:16 (UTC).

TOM TOM INVESTMENT INC VS RICHARD SMITH ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 TOM TOM INVESTMENT INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RICHARD SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5890

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOM TOM INVESTMENT INC

Defendants

SMITH RICHARD

SMITH DEVELOPMENT

TRAN LUONE TUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TSAY TOM C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

WEINSTEIN MARK A. ESQ.

SHYER LISA N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERNCE, AND ALL RELATED DATES

2/9/2018: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERNCE, AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order

5/15/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tom Tom Investment, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 16; (Motion to Strike; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketEx-parte Request for Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketEXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FOR STOPPING THE CONSTRUCTION WORK AFFECTING THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT S DEODAR LANE, BRADBURY, CA, 91008 SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tom Tom Investment, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Nov. 21. 2017 4:15PM No. 8674 P 2

Lisa N. Shyer — State Bar No. 195238 Thomas R. Burns — State Bar No. 297577

Superior Court of Californig

2 lPROCTER & SHYER, LLP ounty of Los Angeles 751 East Daily Drive, Suite 410 Camarillo, California 93010 NOV 21 2017 Phone: (805) 278-0920 Sherri R i 4 Facsimile: (805) 2780289 Byem : %rter. Executive Omce[;/eClerk 5 || Email: tom@proctershyer.com Jenny D. Truong Puy 6 || Attorneys for Defendant, LUONG TUAN TRAN and LYNNE M. TRAN 7

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ? FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

10 1l TOM TOM INVESTMENT, INC., CASE NO. BC645890 12 Plaintiff, Assigned to Honorable Rita Miller 13 Dept.: 16 vs. 14 Complaint filed: January 5, 2017

RICHARD SMITH, an individual, SMITH 15 || PEVELOPMENT, a California business entity, | DEFENDANTS, LUONG TUAN TRAN form unknown; LUONG T. TRAN, an | AND LYNNE M. TRAN’S, NOTICE OF 16 || individual, LYNNE TRAN, an individual; and | NON-OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ DOES 1 - 25, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 17 PLAINTIFF, TOM TOM INVESTMENT, Defendants. INC.’S, SECOND AMENDED

COMPLAINT

Date: November 29, 2017 Time: 9;00 a.m. Reservation No.: 171009257358

21 || TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

99 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE no parties have filed or served any opposition to defendants, 23 [[LUONG TUAN TRAN and LYNNE M. TRAN’Ss motion to strike portions of plaintiff’s second 24 ||amended complaint. Defense counsel never recejved an opposition. Defendants, LUONG TUAN

25 || TRAN and LYNNE M. TRAN’s reply brief was due to be filed November 20, 2017.

1 DEFENDANTS, LUONG TUAN TRAN AND LYNNE M. TRAN’S, NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, TOM TOM INVESTMENT, INC.’S,

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smith Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHYER LISA NOEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINSTEIN MARK A