This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:32:38 (UTC).

TOLL BROTHERS INC ET AL VS SEMPRA ENERGY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 TOLL BROTHERS INC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SEMPRA ENERGY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4622

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

TOLL BROTHERS INC

Defendants

SEMPRA ENERGY

ROWLAND G. JOYCE

ARRIOLA DENNIS

KNIGHT JESSIE

WYRSCH MARTHA B.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

LANE J. BRET

HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A.

DAVIS STEVEN D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP

ISAACSON WILLIAM

SIRES CARLOS

Defendant Attorney

DRAGNA JAMES J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/1/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

9/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

Objection

9/13/2017: Objection

Request for Judicial Notice

4/26/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/3/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

11/27/2018: Stipulation and Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDeveloper Plaintiffs' Separate Status Conference Statement Re Additional Issues; Filed by TOLL BROTHERS INC (Plaintiff); PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re Reassignment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Regarding Discoverability of Communications with Experts); Filed by TOLL BROTHERS INC (Plaintiff); PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SEMPRA ENERGY (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketObjection Document; Filed by TOLL BROTHERS INC (Plaintiff); PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketObjection OBJECTION OF TOLL BROTHERS, INC. AND PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY TO [PROPOSED] REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6: PROTOCOLS FOR COMMON BENEFIT COMPENSATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by TOLL BROTHERS INC (Plaintiff); PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TOLL BROTHERS INC (Plaintiff); PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A. is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTER RANCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TOLL BROTHERS, INC. is a litigant