This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 13:53:18 (UTC).

TOKHUNTS, MUSHEG VS SARGSYAN, NARINE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 TOKHUNTS, MUSHEG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SARGSYAN, NARINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0636

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOKHUNTS MUSHEG

Respondent

SARGSYAN NARINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OPRI DEBRA A

HAYATDAVOODI ARSALAN

Respondent Attorney

SMITH ROBERT FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

10/29/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/12/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Debra A. Opri Sub Out

7/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Debra A. Opri Sub Out

Request - Trial Setting - Rejected - request is incomplete

7/27/2021: Request - Trial Setting - Rejected - request is incomplete

Notice - Change of Address

7/27/2021: Notice - Change of Address

FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Trial/Default

7/28/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Trial/Default

Ex Parte - Application

7/29/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

7/29/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Minute Order

7/29/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

8/2/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Minute Order

8/2/2021: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Application

8/2/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Declaration

8/3/2021: Declaration

Declaration

8/3/2021: Declaration

Ex Parte - Application

8/3/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Proof of Service - re: Fl300 fl305 fl311 mc030

8/3/2021: Proof of Service - re: Fl300 fl305 fl311 mc030

Minute Order

8/5/2021: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Application

8/5/2021: Ex Parte - Application

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Sanchez DuFour, Robert E., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Sanchez DuFour, Robert E., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Sanchez DuFour, Robert E., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCustody Order - Juvenile Final Judgment - Non Closing Order (A ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Atty. Debra A. Opri Sub In ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)