This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2019 at 00:12:49 (UTC).

TODD, STEPHEN JON - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 TODD, STEPHEN JON - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7188

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TODD TINA SUSAN

Decedent

TODD STEPHEN JON

Not Classified By Court

MADSEN RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

LARSON CHARLES LARS

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

8/21/2019: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Order - Approving Account - Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition to Approve the Late Filing of a Spousal Election, Petition for Statutory Fees and Petit

7/2/2019: Order - Approving Account - Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition to Approve the Late Filing of a Spousal Election, Petition for Statutory Fees and Petit

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

8/2/2018: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

8/7/2018: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

9/6/2018: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

9/14/2018: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Order for Probate

9/20/2018: Order - Order for Probate

Bond - SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

9/26/2018: Bond - SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

11/7/2018: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Assignment - Assignment of Interest in Estate

3/18/2019: Assignment - Assignment of Interest in Estate

Inventory & Appraisal - Final Inventory

3/18/2019: Inventory & Appraisal - Final Inventory

Miscellaneous Document - Spousal Election

3/18/2019: Miscellaneous Document - Spousal Election

Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

3/18/2019: Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

Accounting - Decedent's Estate - First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account

3/18/2019: Accounting - Decedent's Estate - First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account

Notice - Hearing

3/22/2019: Notice - Hearing

Supplement - Supplement to First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition for Fees...

5/22/2019: Supplement - Supplement to First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition for Fees...

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketTERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketOrder - Approving Account (Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition to Approve the Late Filing of a Spousal Election, Petition for Statutory Fees and Petition for Distribution of Estate )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account, Petition for Fees... ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment of Interest in Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketAccounting - Decedent's Estate (First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON CHARLES L.