This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 10:17:37 (UTC).

TODD ROBERSON VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 TODD ROBERSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0860

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERSON TODD

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Todd Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Todd Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Todd Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Todd Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.