This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 09:27:19 (UTC).

TODD BLOOM VS MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 TODD BLOOM filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6052

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLOOM TODD

Defendants

MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHTANI AANAND

Defendant Attorney

LOCASCIO PAMELA RENEE

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

7/28/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JIN KAYE SOTO, #7783

7/28/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JIN KAYE SOTO, #7783

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...) OF 07/28/2021

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...) OF 07/28/2021

Reply - REPLY MIDWAY RENT A CAR INCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING

7/21/2021: Reply - REPLY MIDWAY RENT A CAR INCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

7/21/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC.S PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

7/14/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC.S PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

Case Management Statement

7/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

5/27/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/27/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF P. RENEE LOCASCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINT

5/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF P. RENEE LOCASCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLY MARZO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING AA

5/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLY MARZO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING AA

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/28/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Complaint

4/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbit...) of 07/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jin Kaye Soto, #7783); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketReply (MIDWAY RENT A CAR INCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING AAA AS ARBITRAL BODY); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (FEDERAL AUTHORITIES); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Todd Bloom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC.?S PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION); Filed by Todd Bloom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (FEDERAL AUTHORITIES); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF KELLY MARZO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING AAA AS ARBITRAL BODY; EXHIBITS); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF P. RENEE LOCASCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND FOR A FURTHER ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER APPOINTING AAA AS ARBITRAL BODY; EXHIBIT); Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Midway Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Todd Bloom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Todd Bloom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Todd Bloom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCASCIO PAMELA RENEE