Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 12:27:44 (UTC).

TOCE, MICHELLE VS GHIUREA, CRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 TOCE, MICHELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GHIUREA, CRISTIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1202

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOCE MICHELLE

Respondent

GHIUREA CRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG TODD BRIAN

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Respondent Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/19/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - of Cristian Ghuirea

11/18/2020: Declaration - of Cristian Ghuirea

Substitution of Attorney

10/29/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

10/30/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/9/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - DV-130 Restraining Order After Hearing

9/25/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - DV-130 Restraining Order After Hearing

Minute Order

9/23/2020: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/2/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/2/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/2/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/2/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department S15 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (Expires 9/23/2023 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Court Hearing; Temporary Restraining Order ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.