Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 09:12:48 (UTC).

TINNA JONSDOTTIR VS HONGSHI SUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 TINNA JONSDOTTIR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HONGSHI SUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2948

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONSDOTTIR TINNA

Defendants

LYFT INC. A CORPORATION

SUN HONGSHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER ROBERT L II

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

6/1/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration re: Due Diligence

5/18/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/23/2021: PI General Order

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/7/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TINNA JONSDOTTIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.