This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 12:04:00 (UTC).

TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP VS AMEERA AMMARI

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMEERA AMMARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0509

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINALUX ASSOCIATES LP

Defendant

AMMARI AMEERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROJ ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

PARRISH PAIGE ROGERS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

4/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) OF 04/09/2020

4/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) OF 04/09/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/23/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT AMEERA AMMARI

9/30/2019: Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT AMEERA AMMARI

Case Management Statement

10/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/31/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/7/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tinalux Associates, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 11:19 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause) of 04/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tinalux Associates, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tinalux Associates, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tinalux Associates, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tinalux Associates, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tinalux Associates, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROJ, ROBERT J