This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 11:09:26 (UTC).

TINA RIFFE VS MICHAEL ROBERT HAMILTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 TINA RIFFE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL ROBERT HAMILTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7310

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIFFE TINA

Defendants

LYFT INC.

HAMILTON MICHAEL ROBERT

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERGENER JAMES M.

GLASSMAN ROBERT SAMUEL

WERKSMAN NATHAN EMANUEL

Defendant Attorneys

LIEBMAN STUART J

DUNKIN CRAIG L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/04/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

3/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 08/10/2020

8/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 08/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/11/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/10/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

6/12/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/12/2019: Answer

Answer

5/23/2019: Answer

Answer

5/23/2019: Answer

Association of Attorney

4/26/2019: Association of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

5/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial (estimated at 5 to 7 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Independent Medical Examination) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Independent Medical Examination) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Independent Medical Examination) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 2:59 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tina Riffe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less