This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 11:46:29 (UTC).

TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI VS ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1985

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA

Defendant

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURTCHAELL BLAKE E.

Defendant Attorney

PALTA AMIT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

9/15/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/4/2021: PI General Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/18/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amit Palta (Attorney): Organization Name: Law Offices of Kirk & Myers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Amit Palta (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/01/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/16/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tina Abdolhosseini (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/02/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Tina Abdolhosseini (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tina Abdolhosseini (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tina Abdolhosseini (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tina Abdolhosseini (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Attorney Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less