This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 15:09:52 (UTC).

TIMOTHY ROUX VS GUARDIAN NATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 TIMOTHY ROUX filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GUARDIAN NATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, DAVID J. COWAN and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0739

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DAVID J. COWAN

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROUX TIMOTHY

Defendant

GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARKHAM DAVID ROGER

HAINES WALTER L.

MARKHAM DAVID R.

Defendant Attorney

PARK DANIEL J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Guardian National, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guardian National, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Walter L. Haines (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 06/15/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipu...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non- Class Action Designation;) of 06/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non- Class Action Designation;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRepresentative Complaint for: Penalties Pursuant to Labor Code 2699(f) for Violations of Labor Code; Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Timothy Roux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markham, David R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES WALTER LEWIS