This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 05:19:58 (UTC).

TIMOTHY MATTHEWS VS HUGO PANIAGUA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 TIMOTHY MATTHEWS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUGO PANIAGUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0910

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEWS TIMOTHY

Defendant

PANIAGUA HUGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

10/10/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/13/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS (Plaintiff); As to: HUGO PANIAGUA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2022; Service Cost: 143.42; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS (Plaintiff); As to: HUGO PANIAGUA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS (Plaintiff); As to: HUGO PANIAGUA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS (Plaintiff); As to: HUGO PANIAGUA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS (Plaintiff); As to: HUGO PANIAGUA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.