This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 11:05:32 (UTC).

TIMOTHY LUCKEY VS TRAVELERS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 TIMOTHY LUCKEY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TRAVELERS INSURANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7843

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCKEY TIMOTHY

Defendant

TRAVELERS INSURANCE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 431.30, REQUEST FOR REENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL.

9/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 431.30, REQUEST FOR REENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL.

Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 430.31, REQUEST FOR RE-ENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL.

9/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 430.31, REQUEST FOR RE-ENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL.

Declaration - DECLARATION STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPT. 27 INJURY, CT CORPORATION CORRESPONDENCE, AVIS, PROGRESSIVE, TRAVELERS, CSC, FAIR, UBER, CHASE, LAFILM SCHOOL, GERALD MARCUS, CONNECT INSURANCE CO

8/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPT. 27 INJURY, CT CORPORATION CORRESPONDENCE, AVIS, PROGRESSIVE, TRAVELERS, CSC, FAIR, UBER, CHASE, LAFILM SCHOOL, GERALD MARCUS, CONNECT INSURANCE CO

Declaration - DECLARATION TODAYS HEARING. DEPT. 27 INJURY, SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER CORRESPONDENCE, ATTORNEY STATEMENT. NO RESPONSE FROM TRAVELERS FOR 85 DAYS OF NOTICE OF INITIAL COMPLAINT

8/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION TODAYS HEARING. DEPT. 27 INJURY, SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER CORRESPONDENCE, ATTORNEY STATEMENT. NO RESPONSE FROM TRAVELERS FOR 85 DAYS OF NOTICE OF INITIAL COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LAWSUIT, DEPARTMENT 27 INJURY, CNA INSURANCE, NO ANSWER FROM AVIS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA NOTIFIED AND ATTEMPT TO FILE INJURY CLAIM TO SUPERIOR COURT

8/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LAWSUIT, DEPARTMENT 27 INJURY, CNA INSURANCE, NO ANSWER FROM AVIS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA NOTIFIED AND ATTEMPT TO FILE INJURY CLAIM TO SUPERIOR COURT

Unknown - DECLARATION OF REFORMATTED FILING/COMPLAINT OF- NEGLIGENCE. SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. FILING ID- 6652110.PDF

7/27/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF REFORMATTED FILING/COMPLAINT OF- NEGLIGENCE. SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. FILING ID- 6652110.PDF

Unknown - NOTICE OF FILING: AVIS ACCEPTS FAULT: REFORMATTED FILING OF: NEGLIGENCE. PER JUDGE MURPHY, SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. SUPPORTING

8/1/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF FILING: AVIS ACCEPTS FAULT: REFORMATTED FILING OF: NEGLIGENCE. PER JUDGE MURPHY, SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. SUPPORTING

Declaration - DECLARATION RELEASE OF LIABILITY FROM LAFILM/TRAVELERS, INSURANCE, TODAYS HEARING JULY 1ST, 2022, SURGERY, FILING ID: 6643995, AVIS ACCEPING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE ACCEPTING FAULT, AMERICAN

7/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION RELEASE OF LIABILITY FROM LAFILM/TRAVELERS, INSURANCE, TODAYS HEARING JULY 1ST, 2022, SURGERY, FILING ID: 6643995, AVIS ACCEPING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE ACCEPTING FAULT, AMERICAN

Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS SUBPOENA TO SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER 06/25/21FILING ID 6648134, 6644060 , 6649942. AVIS BUDGET ACCEPTING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE, FAIR, AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT

7/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION TRAVELERS SUBPOENA TO SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER 06/25/21FILING ID 6648134, 6644060 , 6649942. AVIS BUDGET ACCEPTING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE, FAIR, AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT

Declaration - DECLARATION STANLEY MOSK RECORDS IN 2021 BEFORE TODAYS HEARING. TRAVELERS SUBPOENA TO SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER 06-25-21 AVIS BUDGET ACCEPTING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE, FAIR, AMERICAN

7/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION STANLEY MOSK RECORDS IN 2021 BEFORE TODAYS HEARING. TRAVELERS SUBPOENA TO SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER 06-25-21 AVIS BUDGET ACCEPTING FAULT, PROGRESSIVE, FAIR, AMERICAN

Declaration - DECLARATION BY PLAINTIFF OF RELEASE OF LIABILITY FROM LAFILM/TRAVELERS, SURGERY RECOMMENDED BY HOSPITAL, ATTENDING TRIAL TODAY. PENDING FILING ID- 661583. 6605447 NEW DOCUMENTS FROM FAIR

6/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION BY PLAINTIFF OF RELEASE OF LIABILITY FROM LAFILM/TRAVELERS, SURGERY RECOMMENDED BY HOSPITAL, ATTENDING TRIAL TODAY. PENDING FILING ID- 661583. 6605447 NEW DOCUMENTS FROM FAIR

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF INJURY FROM THE UNITED STATES, LOCATION SERVICES AND UNLAWFUL LEGAL SERVICE DATA REPORTING FROM UNICOURT.COM , TRELLIS LAW, AND NON-REPORTING OF THI

6/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF INJURY FROM THE UNITED STATES, LOCATION SERVICES AND UNLAWFUL LEGAL SERVICE DATA REPORTING FROM UNICOURT.COM , TRELLIS LAW, AND NON-REPORTING OF THI

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THE DEFENDANTS CCP 998 OFFERS IN SUPPORT OF COMPROMISING AND SETTLING THE CASE

6/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THE DEFENDANTS CCP 998 OFFERS IN SUPPORT OF COMPROMISING AND SETTLING THE CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS REJECTION OF DEFENDANTS CCP 998 OFFERS TO COMPROMISE AND SETTLE THE CASE WITH PLAINTIFFS ADVISING DEFENDANTS OF PREPARATION FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 30TH, 2022 IN SUPP

6/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS REJECTION OF DEFENDANTS CCP 998 OFFERS TO COMPROMISE AND SETTLE THE CASE WITH PLAINTIFFS ADVISING DEFENDANTS OF PREPARATION FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 30TH, 2022 IN SUPP

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF UNCUT VIDEO AND RAW IMAGES OF LIQUIDS ON SET WITH NO WET FLOOR SIGNS, SAFETY CONES OR WARNING SIGNS TO PROTECT PLAINTIFF BEFORE OFFERING 2 CCP 998

6/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF UNCUT VIDEO AND RAW IMAGES OF LIQUIDS ON SET WITH NO WET FLOOR SIGNS, SAFETY CONES OR WARNING SIGNS TO PROTECT PLAINTIFF BEFORE OFFERING 2 CCP 998

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF THE DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY SUSAN KAY ANDERSEN RECEIVING SEPARATE FILINGS WITH OUR FINAL CORRESPONDENCE SENT TODAY JUNE 13TH, 2022 AND TO DEPT 27 REGARD

6/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF THE DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY SUSAN KAY ANDERSEN RECEIVING SEPARATE FILINGS WITH OUR FINAL CORRESPONDENCE SENT TODAY JUNE 13TH, 2022 AND TO DEPT 27 REGARD

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS EXPULSION AFTER NOTIFYING AND CONTACTING AN ATTORNEY AFTER BEING ADVISED IN WRITING THAT PLAINTIFF WAS SEVERELY INJURED BY FAIR TECHNOLOGIES WHILE ENROLLED IN T

6/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS EXPULSION AFTER NOTIFYING AND CONTACTING AN ATTORNEY AFTER BEING ADVISED IN WRITING THAT PLAINTIFF WAS SEVERELY INJURED BY FAIR TECHNOLOGIES WHILE ENROLLED IN T

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/1/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 430.31, REQUEST FOR RE-ENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL. Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration TRAVELERS VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 431.30, REQUEST FOR REENROLLMENT ONLINE FROM DEFENDANTS, PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES, PEACE TREATY WITH LAFILM SCHOOL. Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration State Of California, Dept. 27 Injury, Ct Corporation Correspondence, Avis, Progressive, Travelers, CSC, Fair, Uber, Chase, LaFilm School, Gerald Marcus, Connect Insurance Correspondence August 26th, 2022, Filing ID 6881855, Avis Answer, SCGMC; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Todays Hearing. Dept. 27 injury, South Coast Global Medical Center Correspondence, Attorney Statement. No Response From Travelers For 85 days of notice of Initial Complaint; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LAWSUIT, DEPARTMENT 27 INJURY, CNA INSURANCE, NO ANSWER FROM AVIS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA NOTIFIED AND ATTEMPT TO FILE INJURY CLAIM TO SUPERIOR COURT; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: AVIS ACCEPTS FAULT: REFORMATTED FILING OF: NEGLIGENCE. PER JUDGE MURPHY, SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. SUPPORTING FILING ID: 6516069, 6652110, 6757320 AND 6757730. Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION OF REFORMATTED FILING/COMPLAINT OF- NEGLIGENCE. SURGERY, ADDED INJURY. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT. FILING ID- 6652110.pdf; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiffs Rejection of Defendants CCP 998 Offers to Compromise and Settle the Case with Plaintiffs Advising Defendants of Preparation for Trial on June 30th, 2022 in Support of Filing ID: 6550906 Dated June 9th, 2022; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Timothy Luckey (Plaintiff); As to: Travelers Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant