This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 11:57:18 (UTC).

TIMOTHY JOSEPH TOUPS VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 TIMOTHY JOSEPH TOUPS filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 3M COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA M. TRABER, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, DAVID J. COWAN and LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5300

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THERESA M. TRABER

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

DAVID J. COWAN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOUPS TIMOTHY JOSEPH

Defendants

3M COMPANY

AMREP INC.

B'LASTER LLC

DAP PRODUCTS INC.

HENRY COMPANY LLC

ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

MASTERCHEM INDUSTRIES LLC

O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC.

OATEY CO.

PERFORMANCE MATERIALS LLC

PPG INDUSTRIES INC.

QUIKRETE INTERNATIONAL INC.

RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY

RUST-OLEUM CORPORATION

SUNNYSIDE CORPORATION

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

W.M. BARR & COMPANY INC.

WD-40 COMPANY

WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AKOPYAN HILDA A.

BONNEVILLE JENNIFER B.

EVERETT SEYMOUR B. III

KUM ROBERT

RODRIGUEZ JOHANNA

TOBIN THOMAS J.

WHELAN KEVIN E.

MILLER LAUREN O.

THURMOND KARL S.

KRISTEDJA AMBER K.

TAHERI ALEX

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION: HEARING ...)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION: HEARING ...)

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

1/13/2023: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2023: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPOINT BREEANNA PATTON AS DECEDENTS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATIONS OF BREEANNA

1/11/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPOINT BREEANNA PATTON AS DECEDENTS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATIONS OF BREEANNA

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/3/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

11/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/26/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/22/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Ruling

8/25/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH OF TIMOTHY JOSEPH TOUPS

9/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH OF TIMOTHY JOSEPH TOUPS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:) OF 08/16/2022

8/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:) OF 08/16/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/24/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Appearance

6/16/2022: Notice of Appearance

Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ALINA A. ANANIAN ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS AMREP INC. AND ZEP INC.

6/16/2022: Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ALINA A. ANANIAN ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS AMREP INC. AND ZEP INC.

Association of Attorney

5/3/2022: Association of Attorney

Order - ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 13, 2022

5/9/2022: Order - ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 13, 2022

152 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Appoint Breeanna Patton As Decedents Successor In Interest: Result Date changed from 01/13/2023 to 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Appoint Breeanna Patton As Decedents Successor In Interest: Filed By: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Appointing Breanna Patton As Decedent's Successor In Interest: Status Date changed from 01/13/2023 to 01/13/2023 ; Document changed from Ex Parte Proposed Order to Order (name extension) ; Exact Name: Order Appointing Breanna Patton As Decedent's Successor In Interest ; As To Parties changed from Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff) to Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Breanna Patton As Decedent's Successor In Interest; Signed and Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference re: Alternate Dispute Resolution scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Alternate Dispute Resolution: Hearing ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service Summons Quikrete International, Inc. Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: Quikrete International, Inc. (Defendant); Quikrete International, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/12/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service Summons DAP Products, Inc. Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: DAP Products, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/12/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amrep, Inc. (Defendant); B'laster LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amrep, Inc. (Defendant); B'laster LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amrep, Inc. (Defendant); B'laster LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amrep, Inc. (Defendant); B'laster LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Timothy Joseph Toups (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amrep, Inc. (Defendant); B'laster LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMREP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Weiman Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE B'LASTER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where W.M. BARR & COMPANY, INC is a litigant