Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 09:16:08 (UTC).

TIMOTHY D. REUBEN VS DAVID GOULD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 TIMOTHY D REUBEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID GOULD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9425

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REUBEN TIMOTHY D.

Defendants

GOULD DAVID

GOULD & ORELLANA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAUCHER STEPHEN L.

HARTZLER TRENTON E.

Defendant Attorney

LEVITT JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

4/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APRIL 28, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APRIL 28, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE F...)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE F...)

Case Management Order

4/28/2021: Case Management Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE F...) OF 04/28/2021

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE F...) OF 04/28/2021

Answer

4/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/10/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/10/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order Re Notice of Related Case F...) of 04/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order Re Notice of Related Case F...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling Re: April 28, 2021 Case Management Conference); Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David Gould (Defendant); Gould & Orellana, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Gould (Defendant); Gould & Orellana, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Gould (Defendant); Gould & Orellana, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Timothy D. Reuben (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITT JOHN S.