This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 09:05:01 (UTC).

TIMED OUT, LLC VS POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 TIMED OUT, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3111

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMED OUT LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

GSD&M LLC

GUT AGENCY LLC

POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN INC. DBA POPEYES

RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES LLC DBA POPEYES AND RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL LLC GUT AGENCY LLC

RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES LLC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES LLC DBA POPEYES

VALERIANO MARK

THE MASSES CONTENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHANTZ-BEKKEN KATHERINE S.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

CASAS JOSEPH N.

MILLER CAMERON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RE STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT RE CROSS-DEFENDANT MARK VALERIANO

1/4/2023: Order - ORDER RE STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT RE CROSS-DEFENDANT MARK VALERIANO

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DATE/TIME CHANGE TO MOTION TO COMPEL HEARINGS

9/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DATE/TIME CHANGE TO MOTION TO COMPEL HEARINGS

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/11/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/11/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONICA PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TIMED OUT, LLCS MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) AND IMPOSING MONETARY

8/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONICA PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TIMED OUT, LLCS MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) AND IMPOSING MONETARY

Separate Statement

8/11/2023: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

8/11/2023: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONICA PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TIMED OUT, LLCS MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) AND IMPOSI

8/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONICA PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TIMED OUT, LLCS MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) AND IMPOSI

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERNEST E. PRICE REGARDING TECHNICAL ISSUES WITH COURT SYSTEM RELATED TO TIMELY ELECTRONIC FILING OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ASSOCIATED DOCUMENTS ON JUNE 8, 2023 (C

6/16/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERNEST E. PRICE REGARDING TECHNICAL ISSUES WITH COURT SYSTEM RELATED TO TIMELY ELECTRONIC FILING OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ASSOCIATED DOCUMENTS ON JUNE 8, 2023 (C

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERNEST E. PRICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANTPOPEYESREGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DUPLICATIVE DISCOVERY

6/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERNEST E. PRICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANTPOPEYESREGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DUPLICATIVE DISCOVERY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAMERON M. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANT POPEYES REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DUPLICATIVE DISCOVERY

6/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAMERON M. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANT POPEYES REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DUPLICATIVE DISCOVERY

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/9/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Protective Order

6/9/2023: Motion for Protective Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 06/06/2023

6/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 06/06/2023

Notice of Ruling

6/6/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

6/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Status Report

5/26/2023: Status Report

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. AND RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES, LLC, ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES, TO CONTINUE TR

5/24/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. AND RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES, LLC, ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES, TO CONTINUE TR

135 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2024
  • Hearing06/27/2024 at 10:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Plaintiffs Notice of Date/Time Change To Motion To Compel Hearings; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
254 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Joseph N. Casas (Attorney): Middle Name: N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Joseph N. Casas (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. (Defendant); RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); GUT AGENCY, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. (Defendant); RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); GUT AGENCY, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. (Defendant); RESTAURANT BRANDS INTERNATIONAL US SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); GUT AGENCY, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less