This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:07:32 (UTC).

TIM GRAYSON AS THE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, DECEASED, ET AL. VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 TIM GRAYSON AS THE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF CLORIESE S GRAYSON, DECEASED, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLORIESE S. GRAYSON DECEASED TIM GRAYSON AS THE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF

GRAYSON TIM

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHROKH KOOROSH K

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

1/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/18/2023

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

2/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Motion to Consolidate

2/28/2023: Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 04/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less