Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2020 at 00:29:53 (UTC).

TIGRE INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC VS ARROYO VISTA MANAGEMENT LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 TIGRE INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARROYO VISTA MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0067

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIGRE INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL INTERGRITY FIRST LLC DBA KELLER WILLIAM INTERGRITY FIRST REALTY A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN DOMICILE DBA KELLER WILLIAMS INTERGRITY A BUSINESSENTITY OF UNKNOWN DOMICILE

PARAVEST ARROYO VISTA LP

DEVAULT KREIG

CHUNG JOHN

BEAR HOLDINGS GROUP LLC

ARROYO VISTA MANAGEMENT LLC

PARAVEST CAPITAL LLC

HOLIDAY FENOGLIO FOWLER L.P.

RETSON DEMETRI

ARROYO VISTA PARTNERS LLC

CCC 5631 PHOENIX APTS LLC

KELLANDER JAMES GORDON

DANIELSON BROCK R.

NATIONAL REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LLC

SATERBAK RALPH T.

BARONE DAMON

EMERSON STONE LOREN

SATERBAK GARY

WSC CAPITAL GP LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD CHRISTOPHER BRYAN

Defendant Attorneys

METSCH PAUL STEVEN

BECKER BARTLEY L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY SATERBAK ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/8/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY SATERBAK ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Separate Statement

10/10/2019: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE JTK ERRATA

10/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE JTK ERRATA

Declaration - DECLARATION - PAUL S. METSCH, ESQ.

10/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION - PAUL S. METSCH, ESQ.

Declaration - DECLARATION - RALPH SATERBAK

10/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION - RALPH SATERBAK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A BRIEF CONTINUANCE OF TH...)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A BRIEF CONTINUANCE OF TH...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PARAVEST CAPITAL LLC AND PARAVEST ARROYO VISTA, LP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

6/5/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PARAVEST CAPITAL LLC AND PARAVEST ARROYO VISTA, LP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

5/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)

5/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)

Reply - REPLY REPLY EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS INSUPPORT OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANTS JAMES GORDON KELLANDER AND INTERNATIONAL INTEGRITY FIRST, LLC DBA KELLER WILLIAMS INTEGRITY FIRSTS MOTION TO QUA

4/30/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS INSUPPORT OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANTS JAMES GORDON KELLANDER AND INTERNATIONAL INTEGRITY FIRST, LLC DBA KELLER WILLIAMS INTEGRITY FIRSTS MOTION TO QUA

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Mail

2/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

2/22/2019: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Declaration - Declaration of Emerson Stone in support of Motion to Quash

2/22/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Emerson Stone in support of Motion to Quash

Declaration - Declaration of Neil in support of Motion to Quash

2/22/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Neil in support of Motion to Quash

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/22/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • Hearing04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Hearing04/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Hearing04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Hearing04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Hearing04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Hearing04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tigre Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Tigre Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint (1st)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Tigre Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tigre Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tigre Investment Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOD CHRISTOPHER B.