This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 15:18:05 (UTC).

TIGRAN TAPANYAN VS INDEPENDENT TAXI OF SOUTHERN CA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 TIGRAN TAPANYAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against INDEPENDENT TAXI OF SOUTHERN CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICK C. SHALLER and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2924

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPANYAN TIGRAN

Defendants

INDEPENDENT TAXI OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

INDEPENDENT TAXI OF THE PACIFIC

THE INDEPENDENT TAXI OWNERS

RED WHITE & BLUE PUBLIC LIVERY BUILDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

EVANS NEIL C

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

10/7/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

10/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

6/7/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/1/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/9/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/9/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

6/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 30, 2020) OF 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 30, 2020) OF 06/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 30, 2020)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 30, 2020)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/18/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE CR...)

8/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE CR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE CR...)

6/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE CR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEF...)

3/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEF...)

Request for Dismissal

2/28/2019: Request for Dismissal

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TIGRAN TAPANYAN on 03/09/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 09/23/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Steven R. Vartazarian (Attorney); As to: Steven R. Vartazarian (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Filed By: Steven R. Vartazarian (Attorney),Tigran Tapanyan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Steven R. Vartazarian, Esq. (Attorney); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 08/23/18 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2924    Hearing Date: May 5, 2021    Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely.

 

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

May 5, 2021

CASE NUMBER

****2924

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Attorney Adam Feldman

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Attorney Adam Feldman (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Tigran Tapanyan (“Plaintiff”).

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is that the relationship between Counsel and Plaintiff has broken down. That is a valid basis for withdrawal. Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel must complete the proposed order and update it to reflect the current final status conference and trial dates. Counsel should note that Counsel will remain attorney of record until Counsel files with the Court proof of service of the updated signed order on Plaintiff. Counsel must serve a copy of the updated signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 20 days of the hearing on the motion, and file a proof of service of such.