This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 04:40:55 (UTC).

TIGRAN A UNANIAN VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 TIGRAN A UNANIAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0910

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNANIAN TIGRAN A

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GEORGE CHEVROLET A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

ARENS MCBRIDE MARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/3/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff); As to: George Chevrolet, a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/03/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); George Chevrolet, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); George Chevrolet, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tigran A Unanian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); George Chevrolet, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGE CHEVROLET A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER