This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2023 at 01:58:56 (UTC).

TIFFANY YAMAMOTO VS ISIDRO GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 TIFFANY YAMAMOTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ISIDRO GONZALEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7335

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAMAMOTO TIFFANY

Defendants

GONZALEZ ISIDRO

POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIRVANIAN NARBEH

Defendant Attorney

COLLINSON LISA D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

10/8/2021: Summons Summons on Complaint

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

1/7/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

2/2/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

8/10/2023: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

8/22/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

Notice of Settlement

9/12/2023: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 09/14/2023

9/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 09/14/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

9/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by TIFFANY YAMAMOTO on 10/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TIFFANY YAMAMOTO as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: TIFFANY YAMAMOTO (Plaintiff); As to: ISIDRO GONZALEZ (Defendant); POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 09/14/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
11/03/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: TIFFANY YAMAMOTO (Plaintiff); As to: ISIDRO GONZALEZ (Defendant); POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TIFFANY YAMAMOTO (Plaintiff); As to: POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TIFFANY YAMAMOTO (Plaintiff); As to: POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less