Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 04:52:14 (UTC).

TIFFANY SPOFFORD VS MCDONALDS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 TIFFANY SPOFFORD filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MCDONALDS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0556

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPOFFORD TIFFANY

Defendants

MUHAMMAD HASHIM AL-BALAD

MCDONALDS USA LLC

KASHA KEVIN

KASHACO INC.

MCDONALDS CORPORATION

K & R CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRIN JOHN

Defendant Attorney

MCDONALD ESQ CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

5/26/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

5/26/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

5/26/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Case Management Statement

5/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/28/2021

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/28/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DARIN W. FLAGG IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, KEVIN KASHA, KR CORPORA

4/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DARIN W. FLAGG IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, KEVIN KASHA, KR CORPORA

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

12/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/3/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint crs# 906821940739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Hearing08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint, Filed by Defendants Kevin Kasha, Kashaco, Inc. and K&R Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Hearing08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Related Case); Filed by TIFFANY SPOFFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K & R CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MCDONALD'S USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where McDonald's is a litigant