This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2023 at 11:35:28 (UTC).

TIFFANY RODRIGUEZ VS COUNSELING4KIDS

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 TIFFANY RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COUNSELING4KIDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK M. TAVELMAN and JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0963

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ TIFFANY

Defendant

COUNSELING4KIDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AUNE JAN T.

Defendant Attorney

MEQUET SHARON SOGOMIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

12/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; THE COURT RECEIVES NOTICE ...)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; THE COURT RECEIVES NOTICE ...)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

11/28/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; THE COURT RECEIVES NOTICE ...) OF 11/28/2022

11/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; THE COURT RECEIVES NOTICE ...) OF 11/28/2022

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

11/15/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/11/2022

10/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/11/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND OTHER TRIAL RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER

10/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND OTHER TRIAL RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Case Management Statement

3/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/29/2021: Answer

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tiffany Rodriguez on 11/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tiffany Rodriguez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Status Date changed from 11/15/2022 to 11/28/2022 ; Filed By: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Result: Signed and Filed ; Result Date: 11/28/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 10:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Stewart in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tiffany Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Counseling4Kids (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less