This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 01:56:33 (UTC).

TIFFANY MIRANDER, ET AL. VS WORTHINGTON FORD, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 TIFFANY MIRANDER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORTHINGTON FORD, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9758

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHISHOLM NOLIA

MIRANDER TIFFANY

Defendants

WORTHINGTON FORD INC.

THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BABBITT GREGORY T.

KLITZKE MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/6/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/6/2020: Complaint

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT TIFFANY MIRANDER'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

8/6/2020: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT TIFFANY MIRANDER'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT NOLIA CHISHOLM'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

8/6/2020: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT NOLIA CHISHOLM'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Nolia Chisholm's Affidavit of Venue); Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Tiffany Mirander's Affidavit of Venue); Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tiffany Mirander (Plaintiff); Nolia Chisholm (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worthington Ford Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLITZKE MICHAEL A.