This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 15:45:22 (UTC).

TIFFANY LANE VS SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 TIFFANY LANE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4390

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANE TIFFANY

Defendant

SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUTTEN HOWARD

Defendant Attorney

AMUNDSON STEVEN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATES SET BY COURT

8/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATES SET BY COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER TO GIVE NOTICE

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER TO GIVE NOTICE

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing Dates Set by Court); Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER TO GIVE NOTICE); Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Single Room Occupancy Housing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tiffany Lane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SINGLE ROOM OCCUPANCY HOUSING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMUNDSON STEVEN C.