This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 09:31:07 (UTC).

TIFFANY FOSTER VS PHENOMENEX, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 TIFFANY FOSTER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PHENOMENEX, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7187

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOSTER TIFFANY

Defendant

PHENOMENEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorney

POLLACI JAMIE C.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

8/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

6/24/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

12/23/2020: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/22/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/30/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by PHENOMENEX, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by PHENOMENEX, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Jury Trial); Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (Case Reassignment); Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PHENOMENEX, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tiffany Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHENOMENEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant