This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 05:43:54 (UTC).

TIERRA BLOCK VS RAMIRO BRAVO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 TIERRA BLOCK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMIRO BRAVO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1831

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BLOCK TIERRA

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 10

BRAVO RAMIRO

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO JAVIER

SEA LOGIX LLC

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL INC

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL DBA RYDER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRAVO RAMIRO

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO JAVIER

SEA LOGIX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOSEPH FARZAM LAW FIRM

FIRM JOSEPH FARZAM LAW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ACKER STEPHEN

VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER A.

LOWENTHAL JOHN S.

CHILDERS BRADLEY PETER

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER A.

CHILDERS BRADLEY PETER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/09/2020

1/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/09/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

11/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

11/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

10/21/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/23/2019

7/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/23/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Substitution of Attorney

7/2/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer - ANSWER CROSS-DEFENDANT RAMIRO BRA VO'S ANSWER TO FRANCISCO JAVIER RODRIGUEZ' CROSS COMPLAINT

6/6/2019: Answer - ANSWER CROSS-DEFENDANT RAMIRO BRA VO'S ANSWER TO FRANCISCO JAVIER RODRIGUEZ' CROSS COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

5/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Answer - ANSWER BY RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. DBA RYDER TRUCK TRANSPORTATION (DOE 1) TO COMPLAINT OF TIERRA BLOCK

4/2/2019: Answer - ANSWER BY RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. DBA RYDER TRUCK TRANSPORTATION (DOE 1) TO COMPLAINT OF TIERRA BLOCK

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 4:43 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 2:50 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Related C...) of 11/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Related C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate Related Cases); Filed by Francisco Javier Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sea Logix LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sea Logix LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Sea Logix LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases where SEA-LOGIX LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACKER STEPHEN