This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 12:57:16 (UTC).

TIARA MCMULLAN VS R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 TIARA MCMULLAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against R F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6579

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMULLAN TIARA

Defendant

R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAADIAN BABAK BOBBY

MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES

Defendant Attorney

BRODY JENNIFER ANN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/29/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER

3/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by R & F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by R & F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference and Order); Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tiara McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAADIAN BABAK BOBBY ESQ.