This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:04:51 (UTC).

TIANYU LIU VS EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT SECURE TRA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 TIANYU LIU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT SECURE TRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0147

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LITEM ZHEN FU - GUARDIAN AD

Defendants

EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.

Guardian Ad Litem

FU ALICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HEDRICK KRISTI K.

DUMONT LOUIS R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROO OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROO OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.

JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC

2/9/2018: JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/9/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

2/26/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/28/2018: Cross-Complaint

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

2/28/2018: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Summons

3/2/2018: Summons

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.

5/3/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.

STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;

5/4/2018: STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;

STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;

5/31/2018: STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;

ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/31/2018: ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF CROSS COMPLINANT EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

5/31/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS DEFENDANT SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF CROSS COMPLINANT EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Stipulation and Order

2/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

4/15/2019: Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference, Trial, and Related Motion/Discovery Dates); Filed by EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial, FSC And Related Motion/Discovery Dates); Filed by EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by SECURE TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by ALICE FU (Legacy Party); TIANYU LIU (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by ALICE FU (Legacy Party); TIANYU LIU (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by ALICE FU (Legacy Party); TIANYU LIU (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0147    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TIANYU LIU,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DIST., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****0147

[TENATATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 17, 2020

Plaintiff, Tianyu Liu, a minor by and through her GAL, Alice Fu, filed this action against Defendants, East Whittier City School District and Secure Transportation Company, Inc. for damages arising out of injuries sustained when Plaintiff fell attempting to board an STCI vehicle.

At this time, STCI seeks leave to file a cross-complaint against Plaintiff’s mother and GAL, Alice Fu, for indemnification and related claims. STCI contends Fu caused or contributed to Plaintiff’s damages by leaving Plaintiff, a handicapped minor with autism, hydrocephalus, cerebral palsy, and gait abnormality, unattended.

A cross-complaint against any of the parties who filed the initial complaint or cross-complaint against the cross-complainant must be filed before or at the same time as the answer to the initial complaint or cross-complaint, which answer must be filed within 30 days of service of the complaint or cross-complaint. (CCP ;; 412.20(a)(3), 428.50(a), 432.10.) Any other cross-complaint may be filed at any time before the court has set a trial date. (CCP ;428.50(b).) If a party fails to file a cross-complaint within the time limits described above, he or she must obtain permission from the court to file the cross-complaint. (CCP ;; 426.50, 428.50(c).) Permission to file a permissive cross-complaint may be granted in the interest of justice at any time during the course of the action. (CCP ; 428.50(c).)

STCI has properly served all parties with a copy of this motion, and no party has opposed the motion. Trial is not scheduled until 3/23/20, and therefore no party will be prejudiced by the filing of the cross-complaint; if Plaintiff and/or Cross-Defendant finds a trial continuance necessary in light of the cross-complaint, the Court will entertain a stipulation or motion in that regard. Moving Defendant is ordered to file a separate copy of the cross-complaint within five days.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secure Transportation is a litigant

Latest cases where EAST WHITTIER CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEDRICK KRISTI K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUMONT, LOUIS R