This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:17:30 (UTC).

TIANA O'NEILL, ET AL VS KEVIN FOUCHE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 TIANA O'NEILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEVIN FOUCHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7386

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'NEILL ROBERT E

O'NEILL ROBERT L

O'NEILL TIANA

Defendant

FOUCHE KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARO JO

Defendant Attorneys

NETTELS CHARLES F.

MCNULTY HOLLY A

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/21/2017: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment

9/21/2017: Notice of Case Assignment

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

12/20/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

Other -

8/2/2018: Other -

Legacy Document

8/2/2018: Legacy Document

Unknown

9/17/2018: Unknown

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Settlement

3/12/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

3/13/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

CoverSheet

9/21/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

9/21/2017: Summons

Complaint

9/21/2017: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Robert L O'neill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Robert E O'neill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Tiana O'neill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Kevin Fouche (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Kevin Fouche (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Robert L O'neill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Tiana O'neill (Plaintiff); Robert L O'neill (Plaintiff); Robert E O'neill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Kevin Fouche (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Kevin Fouche (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.