This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 06:22:18 (UTC).

THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER 13, 2016

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER 13, 2016 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4508

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

THOMPSON DAVID K

THOMPSON BRIAN R

Not Classified By Court

THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VELASCO PAUL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

5/7/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

6/30/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less