Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 22:27:00 (UTC).

THOMPSON, CAROLYN J VS THOMPSON, RICHARD, III

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 THOMPSON, CAROLYN J filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMPSON, RICHARD, III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMPSON CAROLYN J

Respondent

THOMPSON RICHARD III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHOOK MICHAEL D

Respondent Attorney

WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

2/11/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/11/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

2/4/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/11/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/14/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/14/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

1/14/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

1/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOOK MICHAEL DITTRICH